Accounts and annual returns REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - JUBILEE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1130859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 26 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 25 September 2024 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 25 September 2024 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 20 September 2024 539 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 20 September 2024 539 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 November 2022 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 04 November 2022 218 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 August 2021 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 August 2021 130 days late Download Open in new window