THE ZAHRA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Zahra Trust is a charitable endownment with its headquaters in the United Kingdom. The Trust focuses on three primary areas, Publications, Productions and Philanthropy. The Trust carries out humanitarian aid across the globe where needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,902,235
Donations and legacies | £3.81m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £75.40k | |
Investments | £16.63k | |
Other | £450 |
Total expenditure:
£3,924,516
Raising funds | £352.28k | |
Charitable activities | £3.55m | |
Other | £19.42k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £371.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.55m |
People

10 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Afghanistan
- Iraq
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
Governance
- 08 May 2009: Standard registration
- CHARITY DAY (Working name)
- SADAQA CHARITY DAY (Working name)
- SADAQA DAY (Working name)
- THE ZAHRA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dr ALI MASSOUMI | Chair | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||||
ALIRAZA JAFFAR | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Faisal Alireza Hasham | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41m | £4.00m | £3.66m | £4.43m | £3.90m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00m | £2.44m | £2.65m | £5.66m | £3.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.41m | £4.00m | £3.66m | £4.41m | £3.81m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £799 | £12.51k | £75.40k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.23k | £615 | £104 | £3.17k | £16.63k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.32k | £109 | £444 | £0 | £450 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £884.42k | £2.20m | £2.46m | £5.21m | £3.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £117.93k | £241.94k | £191.30k | £449.72k | £352.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.22k | £32.27k | £21.92k | £22.01k | £24.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £732.05k | £1.99m | £2.15m | £0 | £3.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £19.42k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £829.10k | £831.91k | £870.09k | £1.38m | £1.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £836.33k | £2.36m | £3.32m | £1.56m | £1.15m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £480.05k | £449.02k | £435.82k | £421.18k | £122.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 JUNE 2009 as amended on 12 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the charity are, for the public benefit, (a) the advancement of the faith and religious practices of Islam and (b) the relief of poverty, in particular but not exclusively among those affected by natural disasters or by war and other conflict, including but not limited by: (i) the provision and maintenance of mosques and religious centres; (ii) the teaching and educating of members of the Islamic community; (iii) the provision of medical and financial assistance; and (iv) the promotion of interreligious harmony through dialogue with other faiths and traditions.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Barnfield Road
Burnt Oak
United Kingdom
HA8 0AY
- Phone:
- 02084527565
- Email:
- info@zahratrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.