MERSEYSIDE BLACK HISTORY MONTH GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and raising awareness in equality and diversity, black heritage, history and arts. Promoting activities to foster understanding between people from diverse backgrounds. Elimination of discrimination on the grounds of race, gender, disability, religion or age. Developing and delivering calender of events celebrating and raising awareness of black history and heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 11 June 2009: Standard registration
- 10 January 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.72k | £41.00k | £47.71k | £42 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.62k | £50.65k | £26.79k | £99 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 02 November 2017 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 30 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF MERSEYSIDE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, AND BLACK HERITAGE, HISTORY AND ARTS B. PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS C. THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, GENDER IDENTITY, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION RELIGION OR AGE 2. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING A YEAR LONG CALENDAR OF EVENTS CELEBRATING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF BLACK HISTORY AND HERITAGE WITH A SPECIAL FOCUS ON THE MONTH OF OCTOBER.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window