Accounts and annual returns SOUTH ESSEX GYMNASTICS CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1129701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 25 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 29 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 29 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window