Financial history SOUTH ESSEX GYMNASTICS CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1129701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.57m £1.07m £1.48m £1.66m £1.87m
Total expenditure £1.76m £1.37m £1.57m £1.74m £1.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £107.31k £396.94k £11.23k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20.18k £127.62k £18.61k £45.15k £63.02k
Income - Other trading activities £76.89k £733 £62.53k £76.25k £74.58k
Income - Charitable activities £1.28m £520.21k £1.37m £1.54m £1.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.21k £309 £11 £969 £2.83k
Income - Other £188.44k £416.94k £25.52k £1.38k £3.73k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.36m £1.55m £1.73m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.21k £13.09k £23.81k £10.92k £6.85k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £11.75k £10.94k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0