Trustees SOUTH ESSEX GYMNASTICS CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1129701

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY SHORT | Chair | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Peter Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Oliver Mott | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Samuel Ben-Aderet | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clive Leigh Hugh Fabb | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE ANN HICKTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE HIBBITT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.