Trustees ST BEES SCHOOL
Charity number: 1129534

Charity reporting is up to date (315 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark George | Chair | 08 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr David John Thornley | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Kelly | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Garth Lever | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian Mark Simper | Trustee | 12 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Lord | Trustee | 28 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Norman ROBERTS | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.