SOUTHBOROUGH LANE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities undertaken by the Church were regular public meetings for worship, prayer, bible study, preaching and teaching the Christian gospel, communion of the Lord's Supper, involvement in overseas mission, evangelism and outreach to the community including the welcome, teaching and encouragement of children and young people, on Sundays and mid-week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Ghana
- Malawi
- Sri Lanka
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 30 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Mark Wallach | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Adedayo Olasunkanmi | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Peter Hills | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Timothy Hughes | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Jillian Anne Hirst | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter Robert Willans | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Ben Marlowe | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Edwards | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Stephen John FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.02k | £141.88k | £135.13k | £140.68k | £138.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.46k | £138.88k | £144.58k | £155.26k | £156.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
387 SOUTHBOROUGH LANE
BROMLEY
BR2 8BQ
- Phone:
- 020 8468 7035
- Email:
- admin@slbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window