Trustees SOUTHBOROUGH LANE BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1129360

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Mark Wallach | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Adedayo Olasunkanmi | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Peter Hills | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Timothy Hughes | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Jillian Anne Hirst | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter Robert Willans | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Ben Marlowe | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Edwards | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Stephen John FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.