EXETER COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of transport services to disabled persons including Ring & Ride service, hire of wheelchairs and mobility equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £37,683 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 13 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET GALE | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ELLEN DENNING | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY NEWTON | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Hill | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Marie Hunt | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS PETER NORTON | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GRAMHAM JOHN PROWSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.94k | £102.34k | £157.84k | £123.20k | £132.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.03k | £108.36k | £115.29k | £139.70k | £137.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.59k | £85.48k | £31.34k | £34.39k | £37.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO THE CITY OF EXETER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS OF DEVON (THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND APPROPRIATE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 PARIS STREET
EXETER
EX1 1GA
- Phone:
- 01392494001
- Email:
- info@exetercta.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window