FAT FACE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fatface Foundation gives grants to make a positive and enduring difference to the communities where FatFace design, source, manufacture and sell their products. The FatFace Foundation pride theiselves in enabling and engaging their chosen charity partners, suppliers, Crew and customers alike to get actively involved and make a real difference to the people around us and the planet we live on.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£717,472
Donations and legacies | £13.33k | |
Charitable activities | £704.14k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£654,736
Raising funds | £279.49k | |
Charitable activities | £375.24k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £279.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £375.24k | |
Retained for future use | £62.74k |
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Guernsey
- India
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 05 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA SARAH AMOS | Chair | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wilson | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Elizabeth Hogge | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Higgins | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Blackwood | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Prosser | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Praeger | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £488.06k | £233.74k | £649.37k | £796.54k | £717.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £543.11k | £379.47k | £635.73k | £629.00k | £654.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £17.17k | £11.50k | £13.33k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £785.04k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £632.77k | £0 | £704.14k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £230.19k | £366.99k | £375.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £405.55k | £262.01k | £279.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £15.46k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £230.19k | £351.53k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £10.47k | £2.88k | £97 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £394.25k | £510.10k | £599.36k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £61.49k | £2.22k | £25.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 24 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
1.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH OBJECTS, PROJECTS, PLANS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 1.2 NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-3 RIDGWAY
HAVANT
PO9 1QJ
- Phone:
- 02392441100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window