Trustees FAT FACE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1129392

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA SARAH AMOS | Chair | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wilson | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Elizabeth Hogge | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Higgins | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Blackwood | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Prosser | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Praeger | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.