FOUNDATION OF ALFRED ORDA PRIZE FOR APPROVED FURTHER STUDY

Charity number: 1129674
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's activity is the advancement of education for the public benefit in the subject of music, in particular by the establishment of scholarships and awards for students of Polish music, studying at the Frederic Chopin Music University, Warsaw, Poland and/or the Akademia Muzyczna in Poland, and promotion of concerts for such students in memory of Alfred Orda.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,582

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Poland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE ALFRED ORDA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ZED SINICKI Chair
None on record
Francis John Pott Trustee 17 August 2012
None on record
PAULA SNYDER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £7.91k £8.47k £6.88k £2.55k £0
Total expenditure £10.69k £10.05k £9.08k £7.25k £1.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 January 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 KENSTELLA ROAD
NEWLYN
PENZANCE
TR18 5AY
Phone:
01736333974
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available