3RD WORLD HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
3rd World Hope provides support to disadvantaged communities in Malawi by providing essential items such as a safe water supply, mosquito nets, healthcare, educational support to schools, food and clothes. 3rd World Hope has also established a number of children's centres and pre-schools which provide hundreds of children with the opportunity of a safe and healthy upbringing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Malawi
Governance
- 28 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Thompson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Riley | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Willliams | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Riley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.92k | £33.17k | £38.66k | £29.95k | £41.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.35k | £20.47k | £29.36k | £35.39k | £30.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 May 2021 | 348 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS LIVING IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GOODS, SERVICES, FACILITIES AND GRANTS. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A CLEAN WATER SUPPLY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS LIVING IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES. DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES MEANS THOSE WHERE A SIGNIFICANT PROPORTION OF PEOPLE ARE IN GREAT NEED BECAUSE OF THEIR FINANCIAL, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL, HEALTH OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COTTAGE
LONG LANE
WAVERTON
CHESTER
CH3 7RB
- Phone:
- 07729651681
- Email:
- shaun@3rdworldhope.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window