Accounts and annual returns IGREJA PALAVRA VIVA LTD

Charity Number: 1129415
Charity reporting is up to date (152 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 January 2025 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 January 2025 152 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 01 October 2024 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 01 October 2024 397 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 03 July 2023 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 03 July 2023 306 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 July 2023 671 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 03 July 2023 671 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 June 2021 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required