IGREJA PALAVRA VIVA LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 May 2009: Standard registration
- 24 January 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 March 2020: Re-registered
- ASSEMBLEIA DE DEUS MISSOES EM LONDRES-ASSEMBLY OF GOD MISSIONS IN LONDON LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NILSON MARTINS | Chair | 21 August 2008 |
|
|
||||
Anderson Fernandes da Silva | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Alexandre Vilvert | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonatas da Costa Albertini | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.96k | £49.93k | £26.91k | £56.22k | £67.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £33.72k | £92.08k | £70.00k | £55.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 October 2024 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 October 2024 | 397 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 306 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 July 2023 | 671 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 July 2023 | 671 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 June 2021 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS (C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF AGE, YOUTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 15
Allenswood
Albert Drive
LONDON
SW19 6JX
- Phone:
- 07308929241
- Email:
- PASTOR@PALAVRAVIVACHURCH.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window