Trustees EDP (EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS) TRUST

Charity Number: 1129398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID ALEXANDER LUNAN Chair
None on record
Charlotte Ruth Robertson Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
James Lloyd Wilson Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Maxwell John Sayers Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Nicholas Robertson Trustee 28 September 2015
None on record
INEZ ALICE LUNAN Trustee 19 August 2011
None on record