FRIENDS OF HELPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receiving donations and involved in fundraising activities to support the work of 'helper' in Kigoma, Tanzania which is helping support vulnerable people and providing education and access to support particularly for women and girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Tanzania
Governance
- 19 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARTYN LEONARD JOHN SAUNDERS | Chair | 03 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Richard Curzon | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Moira Allen | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
BRIDGET NIGHTINGALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.96k | £36.66k | £36.66k | £43.22k | £52.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.39k | £39.39k | £39.13k | £42.99k | £43.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN WESTERN TANZANIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SCHOOL CHILDREN AND WOMEN. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY IN PARTICULAR BETWEEN WOMEN AND MEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT IN WESTERN TANZANIA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS DEEMED FIT BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
WESTERN TANZANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Philips & St. James Church
King George Road
CHATHAM
Kent
ME5 0TZ
- Phone:
- 01634868709
- Email:
- pbnights@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window