Trustees LONDON CHRISTIAN SCHOOL LTD

Charity Number: 1133692

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRIS FISHLOCK Chair
UK CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS LTD
Received: On time
Jonathan Monro Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Michael Burden Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Grace Huang Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Martha Isabel West Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Thomas Wright Trustee 08 January 2020
None on record
SIR CHARLES HOARE BT Trustee 12 September 2016
None on record
NICOLA COLLETT WHITE Trustee 08 February 2016
None on record
Joseph Ammoun Trustee 19 June 2013
None on record