TAGADERE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Only user led self help support group for people with HIV in Notts. Successful weekly Drop-in provides peer support, home-cooked meal, safe space, access to information and advice from HIV specialist professionals. Regular educational and therapeutic workshops. Support members into work, training, learning. 24hr Crisis Support available via telephone & website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PHILIP STANBRIDGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
WENDY ALLEN | Trustee | 12 August 2012 |
|
|||||
SIMON ALEXANDER SMALLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
* TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HIV POSITIVE, THEIR PARTNERS, FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS IN NOTTINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS THAT RELATE TO LIVING WITH HIV
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOTTINGHAM CVS
7 MANSFIELD ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 3FB
- Phone:
- 07766800514
- Email:
- info@tagadere.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window