FACULTY OF CONFLICT AND CATASTROPHE MEDICINE OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON

Charity number: 1131556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Faculty organises part-time courses in Conflict & Catastrophe Medicine, provides funding for undergraduates to participate in these courses, and arranges joint meetings and seminars.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £59,345
Total expenditure: £68,588

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Timothy John Villiers Yates Trustee 23 June 2023
RAHERE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
Prof Luigi Gerard Anthony Martini Trustee 17 June 2022
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Lee Nigel Winter-Dean Trustee 17 June 2022
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
Professor Christopher Martin Nutting Trustee 18 June 2021
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF HEAD AND NECK ONCOLOGISTS
Received: On time
Dr Timothy David Baker Trustee 18 March 2020
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr DAVID BARRINGTON JEFFERYS Trustee 18 March 2020
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
Prof Fiona Jane Wilcox Trustee 17 October 2018
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
DR J E NEILD Trustee 25 October 2017
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr PEADAR O'MORDHA Trustee 17 August 2016
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
DEREK WESTWOOD ADAMS Trustee 13 August 2014
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
AIR VICE-MARSHAL AROOP KUMAR MOZUMDER Trustee 14 December 2012
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
PROFESSOR JANE ANDERSON Trustee 15 December 2011
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
NATIONAL AIDS TRUST
Received: On time
HIV.NET
Received: On time
PAINTINGS IN HOSPITALS
Received: 56 days late
Dr JONATHAN JAMES CORNELIUS HOLLIDAY CVO Trustee 15 December 2011
THE CURRIER'S COMPANY MILLENNIUM TRUST FUND
Received: On time
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN GODFREY FARTHING Trustee
None on record
Dr JOHN CHRISTOPHER MOORE GILLON Trustee
None on record
Dr ROY NEWBERRY PALMER Trustee
THE ROGERS PRIZE CHARITY
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY FOR RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF MEDICAL MEN
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
DR CHARLES MACKWORTH-YOUNG Trustee
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
PROFESSOR MARTIN NEIL ROSSOR Trustee
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £75.98k £77.35k £63.75k £52.21k £59.35k
Total expenditure £67.55k £68.87k £89.37k £97.00k £68.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 09 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 09 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
APOTHECARIES HALL
BLACK FRIARS LANE
LONDON
EC4V 6EJ
Phone:
0207 236 1189