STANHILL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote charitable purposes for the benefit of: the community of Lancashire, racial harmony, education, culture, financial hardship, advancement of faith, humanitarian causes, exclusively charitable causes in accordance with the laws of England and Wales as the Trustees may from time to time decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
- Throughout London
- Italy
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WASEEM SHIRAZ | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ANTON DE PIRO D'AMICO INGUANEZ | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|||||||||
ILYAS KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.95k | £59.50k | £349.22k | £287.72k | £78.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.11k | £161.68k | £296.77k | £337.16k | £81.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 October 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 08 October 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF LANCASHIRE (AND THE SURROUNDING AREA) AND IN PARTICULAR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE ASIAN COMMUNITY, FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: TO ADVANCE RACIAL HARMONY, INTEGRATION AND EQUALITY AMONGST THE SAID COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE FURTHER OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PEOPLE IN THE SAID COMMUNITY. TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE EDUCATION AND WELL-BEING OF THE SAID COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, WOMEN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES, ACTIVITIES , EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING AND INTEGRATION OF ISLAMIC RELIGION AND CULTURES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR SUPPORTING THE ACTIVITIES OF IMAMS AND OTHER RELIGIOUS AND COMMUNITY OFFICERS TO TEACH THE ISLAMIC WAY OF LIFE AS A PEACEFUL RELIGION. TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OF INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE SAID COMMUNITY WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF MILITARY SERVICE, WAR OR TERRORISM. THE ADVANCEMENT OF FAITH WITHIN CHRISTIAN COMMUNITIES AND RELIGIOUS ORDERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPE. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HARDSHIP AND MAINTENANCE GRANTS TO STUDENTS AND SUPPORT TO SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES. TO SUPPORT HUMANITARIAN CAUSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY. TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANHILL FOUNDATION
Second Floor
Partnership House
Carlisle Place
London
SW1P 1BX
- Phone:
- 02033019339
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window