Accounts and annual returns KINGSBRIDGE & MALBOROUGH UNITED JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1130973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 26 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 07 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required