Financial history SRI LANKAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF EAST LONDON

Charity number: 1131486
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £131.05k £73.10k £170.08k £202.49k £248.80k
Total expenditure £27.08k £55.28k £56.29k £60.26k £124.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A