LITTLE AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping internally dispaced people in Sri Lanka
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 18 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathiramalai Nandacumaaren | Chair | 23 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sivakumar Ponuthurai | Trustee | 23 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karnan Jeyabalan | Trustee | 23 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sugendiran Rajasingham | Trustee | 23 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR THAMBIRAYAH JEYABALAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.42k | £12.23k | £11.12k | £11.05k | £23.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.16k | £10.76k | £10.02k | £9.27k | £17.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO SRI LANKAN VICTIMS OF THE CIVIL WAR BY SUPPLYING MEDICAL AID, FOOD, CLOTHING AND EDUCATION
Area of benefit
UNDEFNED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 WENSLEYDALE AVENUE
ILFORD
IG5 0NA
- Phone:
- 07843306935
- Email:
- info@littleaid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window