NORWICH CHRISTIAN RESOURCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities include a Christian bookshop plus the sale of cards and Church requisites, a daytime cafe and evening events both for specific groups and the general public. In addition, we provide outreach book sales at events organised by the Norwich Diocese. The main area in which we operate is Norwich and Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JAMES TALBOT | Chair | 27 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev Neil Walker | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HELENA JOAN SMITH | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.87k | £235.34k | £189.37k | £219.30k | £186.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £268.57k | £222.56k | £178.58k | £222.87k | £199.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £58.89k | £38.72k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 25 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN NORWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF OPERATING A CHRISTIAN RESOURCE CENTRE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MICHAEL AT PLEA CHURCH
REDWELL STREET
NORWICH
NR2 4SN
- Phone:
- 01603619731
- Email:
- norwichcrc@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window