Financial history CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS IN NORWICH AND EAST NORFOLK LIMITED

Charity number: 1130265
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £26.44k £726.35k £765.68k £0 £0
Total expenditure £150.97k £764.51k £767.23k £115.80k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £10.69k £10.70k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £715.35k £754.85k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £309 £118 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £763.01k £765.48k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.50k £1.75k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A