SOMALI DIASPORA CULTURE AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting sports and culture among Somali Diaspora in UK and Overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Denmark
- Djibouti
- Finland
- Italy
- Kenya
- Norway
- Somalia
- Sweden
Governance
- 19 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDULLAHI ALI SHEIKH-DON | Chair |
|
||||||
NADIFA ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDI DAHIR AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDULLAHI EREG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED MOALIN-SALAD IMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2019 | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.56k | £7.04k | £8.15k | £7.77k | £8.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £6.92k | £7.91k | £7.58k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF SOMALI CITIZENS WHEREVER THEY MAY BE, AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT RECREATION OR LEISURE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF ENHANCING THE CONDITION IN LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS BY MAKING GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
266 Tiverton Road
Tottenham
London
N15 6RT
- Phone:
- 02088092317
- Email:
- somalidiaspora@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window