Accounts and annual returns AMORIA BOND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1132381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2025 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2025 345 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required