AMORIA BOND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of young people by providing for facilities for education Promote/assist any charitable activity directed to the care or special education of people who have learning difficulties or are physically disabled or suffer from mental health problems Promote/assist any charitable activity directed to the relief of poverty caused by disability,social or economic circumstances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH MICHAEL LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL DAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICKOLAS BARROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.69k | £3.03k | £6.26k | £33.56k | £12.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.48k | £7.26k | £8.46k | £28.31k | £14.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2025 | 345 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 12 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE TRUST IS A GRANT MAKING TRUST. IT WILL APPLY ITS INCOME BY MAKING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND CHARITIES TO FURTHER THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, SOUTH AMERICA, AFRICA AND ASIA I TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST ANY CHARITABLE ACTIVITY DIRECTED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY CAUSED BY DISABILITY, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES II TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR EDUCATION; AND III TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST ANY CHARITABLE ACTIVITY DIRECTED TO THE CARE OR SPECIAL EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES OR ARE PHYSICALLY DISABLED OR SUFFER FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM, SOUTH AMERICA, AFRICA AND ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amoria Bond Charitable Trust
One Didsbury Point
2 The Avenue
Didsbury
MANCHESTER
M20 2EY
- Phone:
- 07779991995
- Email:
- charity@amoriabond.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window