DAR-AL-ARQAM (HOUSE OF ARQAM) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION / TRAINING RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES ARTS / CULTURE / HERITAGE / SCIENCE AMATEUR SPORT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mahdi Anayet Ahmed | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajib Ahmed | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mohamed Afzal Bakhtary | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.85k | £179.21k | £121.38k | £93.27k | £298.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.26k | £47.71k | £106.17k | £116.89k | £162.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2021 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2021 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY LIVING IN THE UK, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CULTURE AND HISTORY OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY LIVING THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF TOWER HAMLETS AND NEWHAM
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF TOWER HAMLETS AND NEWHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Kitcat Terrace
London
E3 2SA
- Phone:
- 07804 426 267
- Email:
- info@daralarqam.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window