Financial history NEATH PORT TALBOT CARERS SERVICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1130262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £299.64k £390.67k £576.34k £501.79k £584.19k
Total expenditure £333.13k £345.05k £382.19k £546.44k £598.26k
Income from government contracts £106.52k £101.52k £105.58k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A N/A £501.58k £584.19k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £501.79k £548.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £576.34k £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £382.19k £546.44k £598.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £7.38k £9.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0