LUTON AND LEIGHTON AREA QUAKER MEETING AND RELATED CHARITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Luton and Leighton Area Meeting is the furtherance of the religious and charitable purpose of the Religious Society of Friends [Quakers] in Britain and in the area of Luton and Leighton Area Meeting. Meetings for worship are held at least weekly at all Meetings except Berkhamsted, at which meetings are held twice per month.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 26 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 18 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 18 January 2021: Funds transferred to 1173865 LUTON AND LEIGHTON AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELI...
- LUTON AND LEIGHTON AREA QUAKER MEETING (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.55k | £380.59k | £316.98k | £93.71k | £54.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315.47k | £307.24k | £230.10k | £82.54k | £51.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 18 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF THE LUTON AND LEIGHTON MEETING AND BEYOND
Area of benefit
LUTON AND LEIGHTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window