ST MARYS RC HIGH SCHOOL - SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND

Charity number: 1130041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing or facilitating public education by lectures, research, publishing educational materials, hands on training; providing extra facilities at school to allow the subject to be studied and by providing education for children in Burkina Faso and anywhere in the world by raising money and on occasions visiting to share our knowledge and skills.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £19,633
Total expenditure: £31,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Burkina Faso

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Dengate Trustee 18 April 2017
None on record
WILLIAM HAYES Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £54.19k £20.96k £37.34k £41.32k £19.63k
Total expenditure £55.85k £52.57k £36.81k £58.30k £31.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARYS CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL
NEWBOLD ROAD
CHESTERFIELD
S41 8AG
Phone:
01246201191