FANT COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision & maintenance of Community Hall for use of the inhabitants of Fant & Surrounding Areas without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions, including use for: Meetings, lectures & classes, Other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants. Do anything that is lawful which will help to fulfil its aim.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 15 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON MANSFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
david charles kennard | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
larraine kennard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN JAMES MANSFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.52k | £24.89k | £24.95k | £24.85k | £22.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.01k | £21.64k | £19.97k | £24.04k | £34.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF FANT AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FANT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
FANT COMMUNITY HALL
FANT LANE
MAIDSTONE
ME16 8NN
- Phone:
- 01622728308
- Email:
- skschoolofdance@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window