Accounts and annual returns TYPE ONE MISSION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1130995
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 09 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 09 April 2022 26 April 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 April 2021 26 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 April 2020 26 August 2021 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2020 Not Required