Masjid Ghousia Jamia Markaz Ahl-E- Sunnat Wah-Jamaat (Peterborough)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide religious and pastrol education to children and accomadate community worship and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 25 September 2009: Standard registration
- JAMIA GHOUSIA ALE-SUNNAT-WA-JAMAAT MASJID (Previous name)
- MARKAZI JAMIA MASJID GHOUSIA AHL-E-SUNNAT WAL-JAMAAT (PETERBOROUGH) (Previous name)
- MASJID GHOUSIA JAMIA MARKAZ AHL-E- SUNNAT WAH-JAMAAT (PETERBOROUGH) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAZIM KHAN MBE | Chair | 31 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Tauseef | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Arshad Mahmood | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tahir Mahmood | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allah Ditta | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Mushtaq | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rahim Dad | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GULBAHAR KHAN | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Rasib | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Zuber | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.43k | £232.86k | £377.00k | £406.56k | £321.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.34k | £157.69k | £244.23k | £246.03k | £421.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 31/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2014 AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2019 as amended on 10 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF ISLAM THROUGH THE FIQH I HANFI & BRAILVI. THIS WILL INCLUDE; PRAYERS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS, RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, THE PROVISION, MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MASJID, RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL CENTRES AND PLACES OF LEARNING, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE LEARNING OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masjid Ghousia
406 Gladstone Street
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 2BY
- Phone:
- 01733566658
- Email:
- admin@masjidghousia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window