Financial history KGV COTTINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1130233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £90.00k £99.65k £80.82k £79.52k £68.31k
Total expenditure £76.40k £59.18k £73.47k £70.68k £60.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £11.00k £5.00k N/A
Income from government grants £16.00k £63.59k £15.33k N/A N/A