Trustees KGV COTTINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1130233

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALICIA MAIL | Chair | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROBERT GIBSON | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richardson | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Burns | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Winter | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOSEPH JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.