RESTORE OUR PLANET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote for the benefit of the public the conservation, protection and improvement of the natural environment by promoting biological diversity and to advance the education of the public in the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment in the United Kingdom and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2009: Standard registration
- 13 December 2011: Funds received from 1085787 RESTORE UK
- RESTORE UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ROBERT EDGE | Chair |
|
||||||
STUART PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER RUSSELL COLE | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £868.87k | £20.38k | £942.85k | £585.58k | £35.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25m | £1.54m | £1.36m | £812.30k | £146.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £25.54k | N/A | £942.69k | £585.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £843.33k | N/A | £166 | £95 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.25m | N/A | £1.36m | £812.30k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.55k | N/A | £42.62k | £33.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.11m | N/A | £1.21m | £662.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE (FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS): 21.1 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY: 21.1.1 THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; AND 21.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 21.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 21.3 THE RELIEF OF HUMAN SICKNESS AND DISABILITIES, AND THE PRESERVATION OF HUMAN HEALTH; 21.4 THE PROMOTION OF HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS; 21.5 THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 21.6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ABOVE AND RELATED MATTERS; AND 21.7 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
P.O. BOX 310
EPSOM
KT17 3YY
- Phone:
- 01737355458
- Email:
- info@restoreourplanet.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window