UK FRIENDS OF MACHON YAAKOV

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides funding to students studying jewish religious education in the United Kingdom and Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Israel
- United States
Governance
- 30 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACOB DAVID GREENBERG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW GERTNER | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|||||
GARY BLOCH | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.06k | £30.85k | £22.30k | £9.94k | £41.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.76k | £5.03k | £22.50k | £35.06k | £32.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND ASSISTANCE TO MACHON YAAKOV, A JERUSALEM BASED JEWISH OUTREACH PROGRAMME WHICH CATERS TO POST UNIVERSITY ENGLISH SPEAKING STUDENTS FROM ACROSS THE GLOBE. B THE OFFERING OF EDUCATION CASES IN THE UK FOR JEWISH EDUCATION/HERITAGE FOR STUDENTS AND WORKING INDIVIDUALS. C THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND OUTREACH PROGRAMMES TO ENHANCE JEWISH OBSERVANCE IN THE UK.
Area of benefit
JERUSALEM AND UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 THE RIDGEWAY
LONDON
NW11 8QS
- Phone:
- 0097250 7097 942
- Email:
- office@machonyaakov.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window