BANC D'ARGUIN, AND COASTAL AND MARINE BIODIVERSITY TRUST FUND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, FIRSTLY OF THE BANC D'ARGUIN NATIONAL PARK, AND SECONDLY OF OTHER MARINE AND COASTAL PROTECTED AREAS IN MAURITANIA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£537,644
Donations and legacies | £51.45k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £486.20k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,175,819
Raising funds | £124.57k | |
Charitable activities | £1.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£737,774 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £51,446 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £124.57k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.05m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £124.57k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.05m | |
Retained for future use | £99.60k |
People

6 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Mauritania
Governance
- 02 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ignace MONKAM-DAVERAT | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
AHMED SENHOURY | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIE MICHELLE GOYET | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ABDEL AZIZ DAHI | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
AHMED ZEIN | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
GUILLAUME TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.66k | £339.19k | £1.20m | £5.35m | £537.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £755.70k | £489.31k | £1.09m | £1.25m | £1.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.79k | £180.64k | N/A | N/A | £51.45k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £5.09m | £51.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1.20m | £251.94k | £486.20k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £963.76k | £967.47k | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £123.43k | £284.43k | £124.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £37.03k | £85.80k | £153.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £438.69k | £532.06k | £636.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £123.43k | £0 | £124.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £10.57k | £9.73k | £36.08k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £32.82m | £34.30m | £36.86m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £1.59m | £2.08m | £517.85k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £20.44k | £32.20k | £59.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 February 2022 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 February 2022 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 January 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 January 2021 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 MARCH 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 30 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, FIRSTLY OF THE BANC D'ARGUIN NATIONAL PARK, AND SECONDLY OF OTHER MARINE AND COASTAL PROTECTED AREAS IN MAURITANIA, AS THE BOARD SHALL DETERMINE, ON THE BASIS OF THE CRITERIA SET FORTH IN THE MANUAL OF PROCEDURES (IF THE FINANCIAL RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE SUFFICIENT AND WITH THE APPROVAL OF AT LEAST THREE-QUATERS OF ITS BOARD OF DIRECTORS). THESE AREAS ARE KNOWN AS " THE AREA OF BENEFIT" 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF "THE AREAS OF BENEFIT" BY. A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES OF THE AREAS OF BENEFIT, B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE AREAS OF BENEFIT RESIDENT POPULATIONS, AND C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION OF THE AREAS OF BENEFIT; AND 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BIODIVERSITY, CONSERVATION, SUSTAINABILITY AND MANAGEMENT OF "THE AREAS OF BENEFIT" AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IS DEFINED AS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATION TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
MAURITANIA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 KING EDWARD STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4HL
- Phone:
- +22245256066
- Email:
- ahmed-lefghih@bacomab.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window