NORTHERN TAMIL ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NTA (UK) organises Tamil New Year and Deepavali Celebrations annually for the benefit of Tamil families living in the UK. It helps to promote Tamil language and Culture especially amongst the children of Tamil origin by supporting Tamil schools, and arts, music and dance in the events it organises. NTA (UK) donates money to charities both in the UK and abroad whenever it can.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Karuna Rajendran | Chair | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Natarajan | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Inbaraj Baskara | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Madhu Shankar Balasubramaniam | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sureshkumar Shanmugasundaram | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kavitha Sethumadhavan | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kavithamani Saraswathi | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sivabalan Balachandran | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Santhanakrishnan Balasubramaniam | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ram Vinayagam | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Siva shankar | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kalyana Raman Venkatraman | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
VENKAT SRINIVASAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALAGAPPAN CHIDAMBARAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ASOKAN KRISHNAIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SUBBARAMAN VARADHARAJAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RAMANATHAN KANDASAMY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ARUTCHELVAM VIJAYARAMAN MD, MRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.13k | £27.77k | £22.33k | £32.95k | £59.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.07k | £35.58k | £24.53k | £38.96k | £53.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE TAMIL LANGUAGE AND CULTURE, DANCE AND OTHER SUBJECTS 2. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF TAMIL PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE TAMIL LANGUAGE AND CULTURE
Area of benefit
THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gateway
85 - 101 Sankey Street
WARRINGTON
WA1 1SR
- Phone:
- 07927927374
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window