ASHFORD DYSLEXIA CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of support and specialist education for dyslexic people of all ages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 15 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Renate Beerling | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Cottrell OBE | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Alexander | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Trigg | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.94k | £31.63k | £22.67k | £3.50k | £5.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.51k | £32.78k | £12.46k | £4.97k | £13.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 July 2022 | 441 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED ON 3 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE FULLER UNDERSTANDING AND RECOGNITION OF SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTIES/DYSLEXIA BOTH IN THE BOROUGH OF ASHFORD AND IN SURROUNDING AREAS. B) TO PROVIDE SPECIALIST HELP FOR DYSLEXIC PEOPLE OF ALL AGES. C) TO ENABLE THE ASSESSMENT OF DYSLEXIC PEOPLE OF ALL AGES. D) TO ADVISE, SUPPORT AND WORK WITH TEACHERS, PARENTS AND EMPLOYERS. E) TO MAINTAIN A TELEPHONE ADVICE LINE. F) TO PROVIDE WRITTEN INFORMATION AND ADVICE IN THE FORM OF PUBLICATIONS FOR INTERESTED PARTIES. G) TO PROMOTE CONTINUED PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF THOSE WORKING AT THE CENTRE BY ATTENDANCE AT LECTURES AND CONFERENCES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Annex
Live It Well Centre
Gore Hill
Canterbury Road
Ashford
TN24 8QF
- Phone:
- 01233427140
- Website:
-
ashforddyslexiacentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window