ST ANNE'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£21,504,000
Donations and legacies | £7.99m | |
Charitable activities | £10.40m | |
Other trading activities | £817.00k | |
Investments | £2.25m | |
Other | £51.00k |
Total expenditure:
£12,278,000
Raising funds | £1.11m | |
Charitable activities | £10.50m | |
Other | £665.00k |
£5,149,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.77m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.50m | |
Retained for future use | £9.23m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.77m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.50m | |
Retained for future use | £14.38m |
People

120 Employee(s)
65 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 12 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 June 2011: Standard registration
- ST ANNE'S COLLEGE (Working name)
- ST ANNE'S (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
65 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen King | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Krzysztov Pelc | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ruy Sebastian Bonilla Osorio | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Venus Bivar | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christian Coester | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Massimiliano Gubinelli | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Samuel Sheppard | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sneha Malde | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ming Tak Ted Hui | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Daniel Armanios | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Saiful Islam | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Uta Balbier | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Syma Khalid | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jennie Middleton | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Antonia Layard | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katharina Janezic | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jakob Foerster | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edwin John Victor Drummond | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maxim Bolt | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Steven Puttick | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Volker Deringer | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor William Davies | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julia Hippisley-Cox | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Banbrook | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sonia Clegg | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Park | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yaacov Yadgar | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prof Stuart Robinson | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FORD | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor DAVID PYLE | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clare White | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Prof Victoria Murphy | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shannon McKellar | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samina Khan | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof Charlotte Deane | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alex Rogers | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tim Schwanen | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Holmes | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sarah Wordsworth | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Graham Nelson | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor ANTONIOS TZANAKOPOULOS | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Todd Hall | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF Paresh Vyas | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROF JO-ANNE BAIRD | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR DMITRY BELYEAV | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor PATRICK MCGUINNESS | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Christian | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Geraldine Hazbun | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor MATTHEW REYNOLDS | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor PATRICK IRWIN | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIAN GRONLIE | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor Matthew Leigh | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor MARTYN HARRY | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor ROGER CRISP | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor HOWARD HOTSON | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Francis Szele | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW KLEVAN | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Imogen Goold | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor DON PORCELLI | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Freya Johnston | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr BUDIMIR ROSIC | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor SARAH WATERS | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor KATE WATKINS | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor CHRISTOPHER GROVENOR | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor BEN HAMBLY | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.21m | £10.00m | £11.48m | £15.16m | £21.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.97m | £10.74m | £13.98m | £13.36m | £12.28m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.47m | £2.62m | £1.48m | £2.60m | £7.99m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £410.00k | £11.00k | £396.00k | £580.00k | £817.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.34m | £5.73m | £8.25m | £9.98m | £10.40m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £44.00k | £119.00k | £100.00k | £41.00k | £5.35m | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.58m | £1.11m | £1.26m | £1.94m | £2.25m | |
|
Income - Other | £405.00k | £526.00k | £96.00k | £59.00k | £51.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £101.00k | £200.10k | £246.27k | £643.00k | £520.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.65m | £9.64m | £12.61m | £11.77m | £10.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £958.00k | £1.05m | £996.00k | £1.11m | £1.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £58.00k | £62.00k | £71.00k | £74.00k | £83.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £227.00k | £224.00k | £222.00k | £225.00k | £237.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £360.00k | £46.00k | £372.00k | £478.00k | £665.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £28.35m | £27.56m | £28.01m | £27.80m | £31.62m | |
|
Long-term investments | £42.56m | £48.68m | £46.81m | £47.82m | £58.51m | |
|
Other assets | £8.77m | £9.60m | £25.69m | £27.43m | £25.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.59m | -£1.40m | -£3.19m | -£2.49m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.46m | £11.46m | £27.13m | £28.54m | £29.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER OF 19 MAY 1952 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 10 MAY 2011
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH AND TO BE A COLLEGE WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD WHERE WOMEN AND MEN MAY CARRY OUT ACADEMIC STUDY AND RESEARCH; (B) ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANNES COLLEGE
WOODSTOCK ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6HS
- Phone:
- 01865274800
- Email:
- OFFICE@ST-ANNES.OX.AC.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.ST-ANNES.OX.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window