HOPE TO GHANA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
H2G is a Charity set up to try and raise support for people in Ghana to meet needs such as education, work needs, humanitarian needs including caring for others, potentially providing living accommodation etc where people are extremely poor and show love and compassion to our neighbours in the way that Jesus would want and in a way that would glorify Him.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Ghana
Governance
- 01 September 2009: Standard registration
- 25 September 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.65k | £12.70k | £8.80k | £1.38k | £1.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.21k | £12.74k | £495 | £1.20k | £680 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 April 2021 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GHANA. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN GHANA BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (AS OUTLINED IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPENDED) IN GHANA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
GHANA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window