Accounts and annual returns HEICHAL MENACHEM LIMITED

Charity number: 1129891
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 05 March 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 05 March 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 March 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 21 March 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 March 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 07 March 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window