THE HUMANITARIAN DIALOGUE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Humanitarian Dialogue Foundation promotes peace and tolerance through an understanding of IraqÔÇÖs history, contemporary society, arts, culture and governance. HDF opened Salam House; a cultural centre in London that hosts weekly talks, discussions and exhibitions by notable Iraqi and international speakers and organisations working with Iraq, the British society and the Middle East.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grand Ayatollah Hussain Al-Sadr | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ghanim Mohamed Jawad Ali | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jaafar Al-Sadr | Trustee | 18 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.84k | £81.43k | £55.02k | £48.76k | £47.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.35k | £95.60k | £50.31k | £55.05k | £56.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 28 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORY, RELIGIONS, CULTURE, DIVERSITY, GOVERNANCE AND CONTEMPORARY SOCIETY OF IRAQ BY THE OPERATION OF A CULTURAL CENTRE, THE PROMOTING OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY; A) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS. B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Lyons Place
London
NW8 8NL
- Phone:
- 02077232888
- Email:
- info@hdf-iq.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window