DIVINE INSPIRATION MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Christian Religion throughout the World. Relieving financial needs and suffering among victims of natural and other kinds of disasters. Provide support for the poor and needy. Promoting religious harmony for the benefit of the public and to promote good relations between persons of different faiths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
- City Of London
Governance
- 28 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV AMPOMAH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JEMIMA OFORI AMPOMAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AGNES APPIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL AYIREBI YEBOAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.43k | £33.15k | £40.72k | £12.21k | £3.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.83k | £26.94k | £33.57k | £11.27k | £3.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; (II) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL NEEDS AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND OTHER KINDS IF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED; AND (III) TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY; (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; AND (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Ansford Road
Bromley
BR1 5QU
- Phone:
- 07904734472
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window