CENTRE FOR ENGINEERING AND MANUFACTURING EXCELLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CEME is a stunning education and business park in Rainham, east London. CEME provides skills, creates jobs and supports businesses that are revitalising London's industrial heartland. CEME brings together a range of organisations to deliver education, training and skills for students at school and college and provides routes into employment in local businesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,373,496
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.74m | |
Other trading activities | £2.56m | |
Investments | £4 | |
Other | £71.03k |
Total expenditure:
£4,887,981
Raising funds | £657.72k | |
Charitable activities | £4.23m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £657.72k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.23m |
People

24 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Thurrock
Governance
- 30 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Ellen Le Vaillant | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Simon Theobald | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajeev Verma | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Cooper | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eman Martin Vignerte | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Philip Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benyoucef Houheche | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hutchins | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noorzaman Rashid | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Alessandro Attanasio | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stubbings | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99m | £3.51m | £3.91m | £4.16m | £4.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.57m | £3.78m | £4.17m | £4.67m | £4.89m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £2.11m | £2.32m | £2.45m | £2.56m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £1.35m | £1.59m | £1.70m | £1.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £767 | £242 | £51 | £21 | £4 | |
|
Income - Other | £2.38m | £47.63k | £0 | £6.97k | £71.03k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.55m | £3.02m | £3.30m | £3.72m | £4.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.02m | £758.65k | £866.47k | £936.01k | £657.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £25.99k | £74.77k | £0 | £66.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £490 | £490 | £7.46k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.30m | £24.61m | £24.01m | £23.24m | £22.46m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.32m | £1.76m | £1.81m | £1.91m | £1.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.29m | £3.31m | £3.01m | £2.85m | £2.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN SELECTED AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE BOROUGHS OF TOWER HAMLETS, HACKNEY, NEWHAM, GREENWICH, BEXLEY, BARKING & DAGENHAM, HAVERING, THURROCK, WALTHAM FOREST, REDBRIDGE, LEWISHAM, ENFIELD, HARINGAY AND DARTFORD (TOGETHER THE "BOROUGHS") BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING; 3.2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.3. THE PROVISION OF TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE IN NEED WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR WORKING IN THE BOROUGHS THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES 3.4. THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.5. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.6. THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES WHERE NEEDED; 3.7. THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY IN THE BOROUGHS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 3.8. THE ESTABLISHMENT CARRYING ON AND CONDUCT OF A CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE FOR MANUFACTURING AND ENGINEERING IN DAGENHAM, ESSEX AS A CENTRE FOR THE PROVISION OF INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL, SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNOLOGICAL EDUCATION TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING; 3.9. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BY THE MEMBERS SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND & WALES.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGHS OF TOWER HAMLETS, HACKNEY, NEWHAM, GREENWICH, BEXLEY, BARKING & DAGENHAM, HAVERING, THURROCK, WALTHAM FOREST, REDBRIDGE, LEWISHAM, ENFIELD, HARINGAY AND DARTFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARSH WAY
RAINHAM
RM13 8EU
- Phone:
- 02085965193
- Email:
- info@ceme.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window